+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- 10:55 AM 5/8/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 81 SLA 00
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/00
On April 25, 2000 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 116(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, GREEN,
- TAYLOR, WILKEN, LINCOLN
- PASSED Y18 N1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 6DP 2NR
- DP: TORGERSON, GREEN, PETE KELLY,
- LEMAN, WILKEN, DONLEY; NR: PHILLIPS,
- ADAMS
- PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- NR: HALFORD; DP: TAYLOR, GREEN,
- PETE KELLY, LINCOLN
- FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
On March 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On March 28, 2000 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 1DP 6NR
- DP: THERRIAULT; NR: MULDER, DAVIES,
- GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, DAVIS, WILLIAMS
- FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 2/11/00
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 116(FIN)
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 5NR
- DP: MORGAN, HARRIS, WHITAKER, HUDSON;
- NR: COWDERY, BARNES, KAPSNER, JOULE,
- MASEK
- FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RES, FIN