+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: SSHB 116
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): STUTES
- PASSED Y37 E2 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 116
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/2020
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
On May 11, 2019 in the House:
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: HANNAN, TALERICO, SPOHNHOLZ, LINCOLN, TARR
- NR: RAUSCHER, HOPKINS
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: TARR, VANCE, KOPP, EDGMON, NEUMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES
- FSH RPT 7DP
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS