+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
- FN2: (DOT)
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE
- FN2: (DOT)
- REFERRED TO RULES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, WAGONER, OLSON, DAVIS, STEDMAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DYSON,
- STEVENS
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: KOOKESH, EGAN, THOMAS, MENARD, HUGGINS
- FN2: (DOT)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 115(TRA)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN, TUCK, MILLETT, PRUITT, HAWKER, KERTTULA, GRUENBERG,
- AUSTERMAN, GARDNER, CHENAULT, JOHANSEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 115(TRA)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(TRA) NT 11DP
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, COSTELLO, NEUMAN, EDGMON,
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN2: (DOT)
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, GUTTENBERG, THOMAS, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, COSTELLO, KAWASAKI
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 4DP
- DP: FEIGE, GRUENBERG, MUNOZ, PRUITT
- FN1: (DOT)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor