+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 115(EFD AM)
- PASSED Y24 N15 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 N1 V1
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 115(EFD AM)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N35 E1 V1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 V1
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N22 E1 A1 V1
- AM NO 5 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 6 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y17 N21 E1 V1
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y1 N37 E1 V1
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y14 N24 E1 V1
- AM NO 10 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 10 FLD Y17 N21 E1 V1
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 V1
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y16 N22 E1 V1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/12 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON
On May 11, 2019 in the House:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP
- DP: WOOL, STUTES, SHAW, CLAMAN
- DNP: EASTMAN
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: STORY, FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS
- NR: WOOL
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
+ − Amendments (12)
AM 6
AM NO 6 NOT OFFERED
AM 7
AM NO 7 FAILED Y17 N21 E1 V1
AM 11
AM NO 11 FAILED Y16 N22 E1 V1
AM 1 to AM 10
AM 1 TO AM 10 FLD Y17 N21 E1 V1
AM 9
AM NO 9 FAILED Y14 N24 E1 V1
AM 10
AM NO 10 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 V1
AM 8
AM NO 8 FAILED Y1 N37 E1 V1
AM 5
AM NO 5 NOT OFFERED
AM 4
AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N22 E1 A1 V1
AM 3
AM NO 3 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 V1
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
AM 2
AM NO 2 OFFERED