+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 46 SLA 97
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/25/97
On May 7, 1997 in the House:
- 3:10 PM 5/7/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 1997 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N3 E1
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES RPT SCS AND CALENDAR 4/25/97
- (H) ZERO FNS (DHSS-2)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y14 N6
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N10
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 114(RLS)
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- ADAMS, TORGERSON; NR: DONLEY
- DP:PEARCE, SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- (H) ZERO FNS (DHSS-2)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y34 N2 E3 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 114
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/97
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DHSS)
- NR: GREEN, VEZEY, KEMPLEN
- DP: DYSON, BUNDE, PORTER
- HES RPT 3DP 3NR
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor