+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
- FN3: (CED)
- FN4: (DHS)
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURNED TO HOUSE
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(L&C) 2NR 5DP SAME TITLE
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF, WILSON
- FN3: (CED)
- FN4: (DHS)
- RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CAL
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS(L&C) 3DP SAME TITLE
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE
- FN3: (CED)
- FN4: (DHS)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 111(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 FAILED Y11 N23 E5 A1
- PASSED Y34 N1 E5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 111(FIN)
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/17 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, LEBON
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 1NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, THOMPSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- NR: MERRICK
- FN3: (CED)
- FN4: (DHS)
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
- DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN1: (CED)
- FN2: (DHS)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor