+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: TORGERSON, HALFORD;
- NR: TAYLOR, LINCOLN, ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(H.JUD/ALL DEPTS)
- FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/CRT)
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD
On April 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, WILKEN,
- GREEN, KELLY
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, JUD
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 111(JUD) AM
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 111(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y31 N3 E5 A1
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, STEVENS
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- DIVIDE AMENDMENT UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1A FAILED Y8 N27 E5
- AM NO 1B ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y12 N23 E5
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER, HAYES, MCGUIRE,
- WILSON
On April 6, 2001 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
- DP: MEYER, COGHILL, JAMES, KOOKESH,
- ROKEBERG
- FN1: ZERO(H.JUD/ALL DEPTS)
- FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/CRT)
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LANCASTER
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCALZI
On March 16, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 9, 2001 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor