+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (78)
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- REPORT REC'D: DEC/SHELLFISH SAMPLING
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- REPORTS REC'D: ADM/AK LAND MOBILE RADIO
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 3 FSSLA 11
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/3/11
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/3/11
On June 24, 2011 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:50 AM 6/8/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT TAKEN UP
- CC RPT ADPTD Y14 N1 E5 CCS HB 108
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y38 E2 CCS HB 108
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT READ AND HELD
- FISCAL NOTE PACKET
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- CC REPORT: CCS HB 108
- FISCAL NOTE PACKET
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 9, 2011 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 A1
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- HOFFMAN (CHAIR), STEDMAN, THOMAS
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N38 E2
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- THOMAS (CHAIR), STOLTZE, GARA
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 108(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N16
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 108(FIN) AM S
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 108(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 & ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y10 N28 E1 A1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N29 E1
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y36 N3 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 108(FIN)
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON,
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/10 CALENDAR
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor