+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- 11:02 AM 8/29/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 9/8/16
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 107(EDC) AM
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 107(EDC) AM
- PASSED Y14 N6
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- EDC RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, HUGGINS
- NR: GARDNER
- FN2: ZERO(UA)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 107(EDC)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y26 N13 E1
- GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N13 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 107(EDC) AM
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDC CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 5DP 1DNP 1NR
- DP: COLVER, DRUMMOND, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KELLER
- DNP: SEATON
- NR: KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO, KELLER, HUGHES
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor