+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 25, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y34 N4 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 106(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/94
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 4NR
- -3 FISCAL NOTES (DOE, DOE, REV) 2/18/94
- DP: BROWN, NAVARRE, FOSTER, HOFFMAN
- NR: MACLEAN, LARSON, PARNELL, MARTIN
On April 19, 1993 in the House:
- -3 FISCAL NOTES (DOE, DOE, REV) 4/19/93
- NR: KOTT, VEZEY, G.DAVIS, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- DNP: OLBERG
- DP: B.DAVIS, BRICE
- HES RPT CS(HES) 2DP 1DNP 5NR
On January 29, 1993 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor