+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/09
- 11:00 AM 6/8/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 36 SLA 09
On April 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSSHB 105(L&C)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- A1 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 105(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2009
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
- FN2: (LWF)
- NR: HUGGINS
- FN1: (LWF)
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- L&C REFERRAL WAIVED
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 105(L&C)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 105(L&C)
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- FN2: (LWF)
- FN1: (LWF)
- AM: THOMAS
- STOLTZE
- DP: GARA, AUSTERMAN, CRAWFORD, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON, JOULE, HAWKER,
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 9DP 1AM
On April 11, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- FN2: (LWF)
- FN1: (LWF)
- NR: HOLMES
- DP: LYNN, COGHILL, NEUMAN, OLSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 1NR
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS