+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (63)
On August 16, 2021 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/21
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 16 SLA 21
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- 8:30 A.M. 6/17/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 E1
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HOLLAND, KIEHL
- NR: MYERS, HUGHES, SHOWER
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(AJS)
- FN5: ZERO(DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y19 N1
- JUD SCS ADOPTED Y19 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 105(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 105(JUD)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N28 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 105(HSS)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- VERSION: CSHB 105(HSS)
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 A1
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
- HSS CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2021
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- NR: FIELDS, KURKA, PRAX
- DP: SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(AJS)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3NR
- DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- NR: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(AJS)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- JUD, HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N28 A1
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor