+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BROWN
On April 1, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SANDERS
On March 29, 1993 in the House:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- -3 ZERO FNS (ADM, LAW, DHSS) 3/29/93
- -3 ZERO FNS (DSP, COURT, ADM) 3/29/93
- -FISCAL NOTE (CORR) 3/29/93
- NR: OLBERG
- DP: B.DAVIS, NICHOLIA
- DP: VEZEY, G.DAVIS, BUNDE, TOOHEY,
- HES RPT CS(HES) NEW TITLE 6DP 1NR
On January 29, 1993 in the House:
- HES, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)