+ − Upcoming Hearings (2)
March 20, 2023 at 1:00pm (AKDT)
-
Location:BARNES 124
-
Description:
Consideration of Governorâs Appointees: Alaska
Oil and Gas Conservation Commission - Brett
Huber; Big Game Commercial Services Board - Larry
Kunder
ADDRESS AIR POLLUTION IN FAIRBANKS
-- Public Testimony --
EXTEND ALASKA MINERALS COMMISSION
-- Public Testimony --
EXPEDITED TIMBER SALES
Bills Previously Heard/Scheduled -
Committee:Resources
-
Location:
-
Description:
-
Tracked Bills to be Heard:
-
Tracked Legislators to be in Attendance:
March 24, 2023 at 1:00pm (AKDT)
-
Location:BARNES 124
-
Description:
Consideration of Governorâs Appointees: Alaska
Oil and Gas Conservation Commission - Greg Wilson
EXPEDITED TIMBER SALES
-- Invited & Public Testimony --
Bills Previously Heard/Scheduled -
Committee:Resources
-
Location:
-
Description:
-
Tracked Bills to be Heard:
-
Tracked Legislators to be in Attendance:
+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SUMNER
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS