+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 16, 2023 in the House:
- 3:20 P.M. 6/8/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 11 SLA 23
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/23
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 103
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 103
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/23
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CAL
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, KAWASAKI, CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNBAR, KAUFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BISHOP, KAWASAKI, MYERS, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR, MERRICK, CLAMAN,
- STEDMAN, BJORKMAN
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 103
- PASSED Y35 N1 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, PATKOTAK, TOMASZEWSKI, WRIGHT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 103
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2023
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/29 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON, MCCABE, ARMSTRONG, STORY
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: MEARS, DIBERT, MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, RAUSCHER, MCKAY
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor