+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (88)
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 60 SLA 01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y39 A1 CCS HB 103
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y12 N8 CCS HB 103
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ AND HELD ON SECY'S DESK
On May 7, 2001 in the House:
- CC REPORT UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *DONLEY, KELLY, HOFFMAN
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y6 N14
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- *MULDER, WILLIAMS, DAVIES
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N34 E5 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 17 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 17 FAILED Y6 N14
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 18 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 18 FAILED Y6 N14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y6 N14
- PASSED Y11 N9
- CBRF SECTION(S) FAILED Y13 N7
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- SCS CSHB 103(FIN)(BRF SUP MAJ FLD S)
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On April 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS ADOPTED Y11 N7 E1 A1
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N11 E1 A1
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- WILKEN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3OR 4/6/01
- DNP: HOFFMAN; NR: AUSTERMAN, OLSON,
- DP: DONLEY, KELLY, GREEN, LEMAN, WARD;
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1DNP 3NR NEW TITLE
- AM NO 5 OFFERED & WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 6 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/9 CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 103(FIN)
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y6 N11 E1 A2
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y6 N12 E1 A1
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- FIN WAIVED PUB HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On March 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 103(FIN)(BRF SUP MAJ FLD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 103(FIN)
- PASSED Y27 N10 E2 A1
- CBRF SECTION(S) FAILED Y25 N12 E2 A1
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N10 E2 A1
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y12 N25 E2 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/01
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N24 E2
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N25 E2
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y13 N25 E2
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y12 N26 E2
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y16 N22 E2
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y14 N24 E2
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y15 N23 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/14 CALENDAR
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- AM: CROFT, DAVIES, MOSES
- HUDSON, FOSTER, MULDER, WILLIAMS;
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, HARRIS, LANCASTER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 3AM
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (26)
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor