+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 13, 2007 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/6 CHAPTER 7 SLA 07
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/5/07
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- 9:58 AM 3/28/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 102
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 102
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: KOOKESH, WILKEN, COWDERY
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 102
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 102
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- JUD RPT 6DP
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS, LYNN
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- TRA RPT 4DP
- DP: JOHNSON, DOOGAN, SALMON, NEUMAN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, JUD