+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO EDUCATION
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
- NR: MICCICHE, MEYER
- DP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- L&C, EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 102(EDC)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, PRUITT
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 102(EDC)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDC CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/3 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- AM: FANSLER
- NR: DRUMMOND
- DP: TALERICO, PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) 4DP 1NR 1AM
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP, PARISH
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: FANSLER
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor