+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/9/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 62 SLA 03
- 11:55 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 102(STA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y13 N6 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 102(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DNP: FRENCH; NR: ELLIS
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, OGAN;
- JUD RPT 3DP 1DNP 1NR
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, TAYLOR,
- SEEKINS, WAGONER, COWDERY, OGAN
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 102(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 N5 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 AS AM FAILED Y5 N33 E2
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y33 N4 E3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): WHITAKER, MORGAN,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 102(STA)
- PASSED Y31 N4 E3 A2
- MASEK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECONSIDERATION SAME DAY WITHDRAWN
- CHENAULT, WOLF, MEYER, LYNN, HEINZE
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- MCGUIRE
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS, FATE, WILSON,
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COGHILL
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: GARA, HOLM
- DP: SAMUELS, MCGUIRE, ANDERSON, OGG;
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 4DP 2NR
On April 22, 2003 in the House:
- CORRECTED CS(STA) RECEIVED
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS, MASEK
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM, SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: SEATON, BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH
- DP: GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, HOLM;
- STA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 3NR
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, KOTT
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor