+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 4DP TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, HUGGINS, GUESS
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN7: ZERO(ADM)
- FN8: ZERO(COR)
- FN9: ZERO(DPS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 101(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, GUTTENBERG, GARDNER, LEDOUX
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 101(JUD) AM
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, LYNN
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On April 25, 2005 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) NT 9DP
- DP: HAWKER, HOLM, CROFT, JOULE, STOLTZE, MOSES, KELLY, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, HAWKER, HOLM
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP
- DP: KOTT, GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, GARA, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor