+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 45 SLA 99
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/3/99
On May 22, 1999 in the House:
- 3:40 PM 5/21/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 101(L&C)
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: MACKIE, HOFFMAN, DONLEY, TIM KELLY
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On April 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- L&C
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 101(L&C)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 19, 1999 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 6DP 1NR
- DP: ROKEBERG, HALCRO, SANDERS, CISSNA,
- HARRIS, MURKOWSKI; NR: BRICE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 3/10/99
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- URS RPT 3DP 1NR 3AM
- DP: COWDERY, PORTER, HUDSON;
- NR: BERKOWITZ; AM: DAVIES, ROKEBERG,
- KOTT
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- URS, L&C