+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (78)
On March 19, 1999 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/18 CHAPTER 2 SLA 99
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 17, 1999 in the House:
- 10:30 AM 3/17/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
- SUSPEND RULE 42(C) Y18 N- E2
- ADOPTED CC LETTER OF INTENT UNAN CONSENT
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y16 N2 E2 CCS HB 100
- CBRF SECTION(S) ADOPTED Y16 N2 E2
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y34 N5 E1 CCS HB 100
- CBRF SECTION 16(C) ADOPTED Y31 N8 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADOPTED CC LETTER OF INTENT UNAN CONSENT
- CBRF SECTION 22 ADOPTED Y32 N7 E1
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y1 N34 E5
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- *MULDER, THERRIAULT, GRUSSENDORF
On March 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N3
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y3 N17
- CBRF SECTION(S) ADOPTED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *PARNELL, TORGERSON, ADAMS
On March 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR 2AM TECH TITLE CHG
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, GREEN,
- PETE KELLY, WILKEN, DONLEY;
- AM: PHILLIPS, ADAMS; NR: LEMAN
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 3/13/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y15 N5
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 100(FIN)
- PASSED Y13 N7
- CBRF SECTION(S) FAILED Y13 N7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y15 N5
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N15
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- CBRF SECTION(S) FAILED Y21 N7 E12
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N7 E12
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y21 N7 E12
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN
On March 11, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 100(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y7 N24 E9
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y24 N7 E9
- CBRF SECTION(S) FAILED Y24 N7 E9
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y24 N7 E9
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 4NR 3AM
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, FOSTER;
- NR: AUSTERMAN, DAVIS, WILLIAMS, MOSES;
- AM: KOHRING, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N26
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y13 N23 A4
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y14 N25 A1
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 5 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/11 CALENDAR
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor