+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (70)
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- FN11: (UA)
- FN9: (LWF)
- FN8: (LWF)
- FN7: (LWF)
- FN1: (EED)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 4 SLA 21
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- 4:30 P.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH S.FIN REPORT
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- SENATE LETTER OF INTENT ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 100
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N- A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 100
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: (EED)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF
- AM: WILSON
- FN10: (LWF)
- FN7: (LWF)
- FN8: (LWF)
- FN9: (LWF)
- FN11: (UA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
- FIN RPT 3DP 1AM
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y18 N22
- VERSION: HB 100
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 100
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N22
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y36 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: (EED)
- FIN RPT 11DP
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN,
- CARPENTER, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FN9: (LWF)
- FN7: (LWF)
- FN8: (LWF)
- FN10: (LWF)
- FN11: (UA)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- FN6: (UA)
- FN5: (LWF)
- FN4: (LWF)
- FN3: (LWF)
- FN2: (LWF)
- FN1: (EED)
- AM: KAUFMAN
- DP: SCHRAGE, NELSON, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT 5DP 1AM
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS