+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On September 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELLIS
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 54 SLA 04
- 1:55 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 10(FIN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 10(FIN)
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/ADM)
- DNP: HOFFMAN
- DP: DYSON, OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- NR: GREEN, WILKEN;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1DNP 2NR SAME TITLE
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- COWDERY, OLSON, GUESS, DAVIS, SEEKINS,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, BUNDE,
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/ADM)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, STEVENS G;
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/ADM)
- DP: DYSON, GUESS, COWDERY
- NR: STEVENS G;
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On May 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C, FIN
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- MEYER, LYNN, BERKOWITZ
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, DAHLSTROM,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 10(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2003
- VERSION: CSHB 10(HES)
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- DP: CISSNA, SEATON, WOLF; NR: COGHILL,
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 3DP 2NR
- GATTO
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOLF
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/ADM)
- ANDERSON; NR: CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WEYHRAUCH
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- WILSON, SEATON
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, STEVENS,
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor