+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/8 CHAPTER 3 SLA 21
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/9/21
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- 10:45 A.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 10
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS, HOLLAND, HUGHES, BEGICH,
- WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 10
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP
- DP: REVAK, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, MICCICHE, KIEHL
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON
- NR: MYERS, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, KAWASAKI
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 10
- PASSED Y31 N8 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 N3 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, DRUMMOND, ZULKOSKY, EDGMON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 10
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N21
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, JOSEPHSON, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP 2NR
- DP: MCKAY, FIELDS, CRONK, HOPKINS, HANNAN, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK
- NR: RAUSCHER, GILLHAM
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- TRB RPT 4DP
- DP: FIELDS, ORTIZ, CRONK, ZULKOSKY
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER TRB
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- TRB REPLACES FIN REFERRAL
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor