+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 14, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
- HSS, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17