+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/03
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:55 PM 6/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 87 SLA 03
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- BUNDE, COWDERY, OLSON
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, DAVIS, ELTON,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 1(JUD)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 1(JUD)
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- STEVENS G, WAGONER, SEEKINS, LINCOLN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUESS, FRENCH, DYSON,
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: THERRIAULT, ELLIS
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH;
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: STEVENS G, DYSON, GUESS
- STA RPT 3DP
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 1(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, MEYER
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y31 N1 E3 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 1(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2003
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- 1ST JOINT PRIME SPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(CRT)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- DP: HOLM, ANDERSON, COGHILL,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor