+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ULMER
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- TRA, CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y31 N7 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 1 (CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/93
On March 31, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT CSSS(CRA) 4DP 7NR
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, BROWN, FOSTER
- NR: HANLEY, MARTIN, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: HOFFMAN, NAVARRE, THERRIAULT
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DEC) 3/31/93
- -PREVIOUS FN (DOT) 3/22/93
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/31/93
On March 24, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BROWN
On March 22, 1993 in the House:
- DP: SANDERS, BUNDE, DAVIES, WILLIS
- CRA RPT CSSS(CRA) 7DP
- DP: TOOHEY, OLBERG, WILLIAMS
- -2 FISCAL NOTES (DOT, DPS) 3/22/93
On March 17, 1993 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On January 27, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND
On January 20, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN
On January 13, 1993 in the House:
- CRA, RESOURCES, FINANCE
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On January 11, 1993 in the House:
- CRA, RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 4, 1993 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED