+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-231)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-330.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-231.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor