+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-1 on 01/23/2014.
- Signature Requested
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Polizos motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 36
- Received in House of Representatives
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
+ − Vote
January 16, 2014: Polizos motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 36
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor