+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-107)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-107.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor