+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-507)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-507.
- Enrolled
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 5:08 p.m. on April 20, 2021
- Assigned Act No. 2021-287.
- Forwarded to Governor on April 20, 2021 at 5:08 p.m. on April 21, 2021
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 897
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor