+ − Actions (15)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-521)
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-521.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1441
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor