+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-66)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-66.
- Enrolled
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On September 8, 0018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-66)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor