+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-53)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-53.
- Enrolled
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 122
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33
- Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 32
- Holley Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2018: Roll 122
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 5
January 16, 2018: Roll 32
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
January 16, 2018: Roll 33
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor