+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-369)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-369.
- Enrolled
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 946
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 198
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: Roll 946
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2019: Roll 198
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor