+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-53.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 441
- Concurrence Requested
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 383
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 382
- Lindsey Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 163
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 162
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 161
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2015: Roll 382
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
April 14, 2015: Roll 383
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
April 14, 2015: Roll 441
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
March 18, 2015: Roll 161
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2015: Roll 162
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2015: Roll 163
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor