+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-191.
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1098
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 151
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 150
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1098
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 6
February 26, 2013: Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 150
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor