+ − Effective Date
- March 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2022-71.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 256
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 118
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Vote
February 3, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 118 Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor