+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Stutts Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2017: Roll 552
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 11, 2017: Roll 553
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 11, 2017: Roll 554
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor