+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-485)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-485.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1248
- Third Reading Passed
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 567
- Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1248
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2019: Roll 567
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor