+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed in House of Origin
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor