+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2017-82.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 278
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 61
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2017: Roll 278
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
March 2, 2017: Roll 178
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
February 16, 2017: Roll 45
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 8
February 16, 2017: Roll 61
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor