+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2017: Roll 547
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
March 7, 2017: Roll 160
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 10
February 14, 2017: Roll 27
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor