+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-82)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2021-82 on 03/16/2021.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 36
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2021: Roll 258
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
February 4, 2021: Roll 36
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor