+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Bussman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Lost in house of origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 417
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Education and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered
- Bussman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 325
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Youth Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2017: Roll 417
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
March 15, 2017: Roll 325
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor