+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Second Reading Second House
- Lawrence amendment adopted
- Instrument Change Adopted
- Read Second Time in Second House
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- First Reading Second House
- Pending Committee Action In Second House
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading House of Origin
- Elliott amendment offered
- Instrument Change Tabled
- Smitherman amendment offered
- Smitherman amendment adopted
- Passed House Of Origin
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee In House of Origin
- Read Second Time In House of Origin
- Elliott amendment offered
- Elliott amendment adopted
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read First Time In House of Origin
- Pending Committee Action In House Of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2024: Third Reading House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
February 14, 2024: Smitherman amendment adopted Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 14, 2024: Passed House Of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor