+ − Effective Date
- September 01, 2023
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- On Third Reading in Second House
- Read a Third Time and Pass
- Ready to Enroll
On May 24, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in Second House
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- On Third Reading in House of Origin
- Adopt
- Adopt
- Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended
- Read First Time in Second House
On May 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in House of Origin
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- AMD/SUB
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred
- Read First Time in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2023: Read a Third Time and Pass Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2023: Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor