+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-199)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-199.
- Enrolled
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Holmes intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 706
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred from Calendar to TU&I
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Adopt Local Certification Resolution adopted Roll Call 87
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 86
- Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2021: Roll 706
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 33
February 9, 2021: Roll 86
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2021: Roll 87
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor