+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by Second House
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 393
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 181
- Third Reading Passed
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 180
- Engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pittman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2018: Roll 393
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
February 20, 2018: Roll 394
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
January 30, 2018: Roll 180
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 13
January 30, 2018: Roll 181
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor